IN HB1046 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Study of sales tax exemptions for bullion or currency. Refers the following questions to the legislative council for assignment to an appropriate interim study committee: (1) Whether sales of precious metals bullion or currency should be exempt from sales tax. (2) Whether the lease of storage for precious metals bullion or currency should be exempt from sales tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of sales tax exemptions for bullion or currency. Refers the following questions to the legislative council for assignment to an appropriate interim study committee: (1) Whether sales of precious metals bullion or currency should be exempt from sales tax. (2) Whether the lease of storage for precious metals bullion or currency should be exempt from sales tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HousePublic Law 16
2015-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 47, nays 3
2015-03-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-10SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-10SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSenator Mishler added as second sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Hershman added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 180: yeas 41, nays 51
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-27HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as coauthor
2015-01-27HouseRepresentative Nisly removed as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Nisly added as coauthor
2015-01-13HouseRepresentatives Wolkins and Heaton added as coauthor
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Beumer
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1046/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/2/a/2e2a47a8/HB1046.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/f/b/d6fba109/HB1046.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/4/c/0e4c3be1/HB1046.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/0/a/410af923/HB1046.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/9/7/3397eb70/HB1046.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/1/0/01103027/HB1046.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/8/f/1f8f8504/HB1046.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/f/7/33f7a75a/HB1046.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/b/0/42b01832/HB1046.180.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/1/b2d1a712/HB1046.193.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/1/fd611497/HB1046.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/b/9/a6b9b4d5/HB1046.297.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback