IN HB1046 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a person to receive a 100% property tax deduction against the assessed value of a barn that qualifies as a heritage barn. Requires the office of tourism development to promote heritage barns. Permits a county to impose a public safety fee up to $50 for each heritage barn receiving a deduction.
Title
Heritage barns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 104603 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 104601 (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 104603 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 104601 (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 117 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 397: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 445: yeas 84 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Steele added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hume added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Klinker added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative DeLaney added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Beumer added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Goodin added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Cherry added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 285: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added third sponsor. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Waterman added first sponsor. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Steele removed first sponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 171: yeas 91 and nays 2 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Hershman added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Battles added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1046 Amendment #2 (Porter), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1046 Amendment #1 (Porter), failed. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Huston added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Richardson added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Ubelhor added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Negele added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Messmer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Friend added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Mayfield added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Lehe added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Gutwein added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Beumer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Turner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Thompson, Clere |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |