IN HB1042 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Representative Clere added as conferee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit managers. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain a license issued by the department of insurance and sets forth requirements of the pharmacy benefit manager. Provides for the commissioner of the department of insurance to adopt rules to specify licensure, financial standards, and reporting requirements that apply to a pharmacy benefit manager. Sets forth requirements and prohibitions of a pharmacy benefit manager. Allows a party that has contracted with a pharmacy benefit manager to request an audit of compliance at least one time per year. Makes violations of the chapter concerning pharmacy benefit managers an unfair or deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance. Allows a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain the license not later than December 31, 2020, in order to do business in Indiana and provide services for any health provider contract beginning January 1, 2021. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hatfield) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Clere added as conferee
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Davisson removed as conferee
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Clere removed as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Stoops and Holdman
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Brown L and Breaux
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Clere, Judy, Barrett, Lehman, Fleming and Shackleford
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Davisson and Hatfield
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Spartz added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateSenator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Holdman
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseAmendment #1 (Hatfield) failed; Roll Call 145: yeas 30, nays 61
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-06HouseCoauthored by Representative Karickhoff
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Davisson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1042/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/b/9/5eb96b4a/HB1042.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/3/2/e23222ab/HB1042.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/7/e/847ecc24/HB1042.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/5/2/4f521ddd/HB1042.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/9/8/65985d18/HB1042.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/0/8/fb0807f1/HB1042.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/d/a/5edad6e0/HB1042.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/5/4/8954f2fa/HB1042.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/7/7/5c77be1b/HB1042.145_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/6/e/2a6e110f/HB1042.154_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/4/3/bc43af8f/HB1042.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/f/f/50ffa9c9/HB1042.275_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback