IN HB1038 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blue LED lights on volunteer firefighter vehicles. Authorizes a blue light on a vehicle privately owned by a volunteer firefighter to be a blue light emitting diode (LED).
Title
Blue LED lights on volunteer firefighter vehicles. Authorizes a blue light on a vehicle privately owned by a volunteer firefighter to be a blue light emitting diode (LED).
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Lyness [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 61 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second sponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2016-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lyness R |