IN HB1037 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Enforcement of equal educational opportunity. Defines "antisemitism", specifies that the public policy of the state is to provide educational opportunities free of religious discrimination, and provides that antisemitism is discrimination on the basis of religion.
Title
Enforcement of equal educational opportunity.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Rep. Becky Cash [R] | Rep. Julie McGuire [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Raatz |
2023-02-23 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-20 | House | Representatives Cash B, McGuire J, Smith, V. added as coauthors |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Jeter |
Subjects
CHURCHES AND RELIGIONS
CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL RIGHTS COMMISSION
EDUCATION generally
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)
CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL RIGHTS COMMISSION
EDUCATION generally
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)