IN HB1036 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Technical corrections. Resolves technical problems in the Indiana Code, including incorrect statutory references, nonstandard tabulation, and various grammatical problems. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2016 general assembly". Specifies that the title may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered during the 2016 legislative session. Provides the publisher of the Indiana Code with guidance concerning resolution of amend/repeal conflicts between

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical corrections. Resolves technical problems in the Indiana Code, including incorrect statutory references, nonstandard tabulation, and various grammatical problems. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2016 general assembly". Specifies that the title may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered during the 2016 legislative session. Provides the publisher of the Indiana Code with guidance concerning resolution of amend/repeal conflicts between

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 149
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-23SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2016-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-15SenateSenator Bray added as second sponsor
2016-02-15SenateSenator Bray removed as cosponsor
2016-02-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-15SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-11SenateSenator Bray added as cosponsor
2016-02-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2016-01-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young, M.
2016-01-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-01-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-05HouseCoauthored by Representative Kersey
2016-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Washburne

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1036/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/1/0/e410ffa4/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/e/5/bbe5f4b7/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/d/0/16d015a4/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/1/6/0516722d/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/4/8/43486956/HB1036.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/3/8/5438f7c4/HB1036.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/4/8/7d48def6/HB1036.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/3/3/74332985/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/c/e/0ece0704/HB1036.15.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/4/e/ce4e8159/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/5/e/105e38e4/HB1036.190.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback