IN HB1036 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies health, education, safety, and training requirements that a child care provider must meet as a condition of eligibility to receive a federal Child Care and Development Fund (CCDF) voucher payment. Specifies that in determining whether a provider meets the CCDF eligibility requirements, the division of family resources may not consider religious instruction or activities. Provides for decertification of eligibility. Requires certain reporting related to safety of children. Requires certain information to be prepared and distributed concerning the duty to report known or suspected child abuse or neglect. Allows the state department of health to release to certain child care providers information from the immunization data registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care and development fund eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 103602 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 103601 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26HousePublic Law 171
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 419: yeas 40 and nays 6
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 463: yeas 75 and nays 21
2014-03-06SenateSenator Stoops added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Holdman added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Taylor added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Walker added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Macer added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative M. Smith added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Riecken added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Mahan added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 281: yeas 36 and nays 12
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-18SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
2014-01-29HouseSenator Holdman added as second sponsor.
2014-01-29HouseSenator Taylor added as third sponsor.
2014-01-29HouseSenator Walker added as sponsor.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 71 and nays 24
2014-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Riecken added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Lawson added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Forestal added as coauthor.
2014-01-27HouseHB 1036 Amendment #1 (Riecken) motion withdrawn.
2014-01-27HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Ziemke added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Summers added as coauthor.
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Mahan
2014-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Smith M, Kubacki, Macer
2014-01-07HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1036/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/c/9/9fc9acf2/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/3/1/6031b0af/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/0/7/b9073a24/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/5/d/ee5de0c5/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/8/8/a9887a26/HB1036.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/2/7/22274e3a/HB1036.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/c/1/01c15f1d/HB1036.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/2/d/312d80a3/HB1036.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/4/0/71401505/HB1036.02.COMH.75.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/8/3/90836a60/HB1036.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/5/2/7a52069b/HB1036.03.COMS.281.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/e/d/aced6dc3/HB1036.03.COMS.463.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/b/2/64b25956/HB1036.03.COMS.419.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback