IN HB1034 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher scholarships and stipends. Changes the name of the minority teacher scholarship to the William A. Crawford minority teacher scholarship. Provides that if the total of all scholarships awarded exceeds the amount available for distribution in a state fiscal year, the amount to be distributed to each applicant shall be proportionately reduced. Repeals: (1) a provision providing that if a student demonstrates financial need to the commission for higher education, the student may qualify for a $4,000 annual scholarship; (2) a provision providing that the amount of a scholarship may not be reduced because the student receives other scholarships or
Title
Teacher scholarships and stipends. Changes the name of the minority teacher scholarship to the William A. Crawford minority teacher scholarship. Provides that if the total of all scholarships awarded exceeds the amount available for distribution in a state fiscal year, the amount to be distributed to each applicant shall be proportionately reduced. Repeals: (1) a provision providing that if a student demonstrates financial need to the commission for higher education, the student may qualify for a $4,000 annual scholarship; (2) a provision providing that the amount of a scholarship may not be reduced because the student receives other scholarships or
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 148 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Representative Friend added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Representatives Bosma, Klinker, Mayfield, Truitt, Riecken, Davisson, Brown, C., Summers, Bartlett, Harris, D., Shackleford, Clere added as coauthors |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representatives Cook and Hamm added as coauthors |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Ellington J added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representatives Zent, Burton, Richardson, McNamara, Torr, Kirchhofer added as coauthors |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Errington added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Rhoads added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Rogers, Breaux |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Representatives Smith, V., Porter, Behning added as coauthors |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Pryor |