IN HB1032 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various pension matters. Provides that the assets of the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan may be commingled for investment purposes with the assets of other funds administered by the board of trustees (board) of the Indiana public retirement system. Provides that an employer who elects to purchase special death benefit coverage for an eligible emergency medical services provider must pay for the coverage annually as prescribed by the board. Eliminates the guaranteed fund investment option after December 31, 2016, for members of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) and the teachers'
Title
Various pension matters. Provides that the assets of the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan may be commingled for investment purposes with the assets of other funds administered by the board of trustees (board) of the Indiana public retirement system. Provides that an employer who elects to purchase special death benefit coverage for an eligible emergency medical services provider must pay for the coverage annually as prescribed by the board. Eliminates the guaranteed fund investment option after December 31, 2016, for members of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) and the teachers'
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Public Law 193 |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 225: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third sponsor |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Brown L |
2016-01-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |