IN HB1015 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Worksite speed control pilot program. Requires the Indiana department of transportation (department) to establish the worksite speed control pilot program (pilot program) for the purpose of enforcing worksite speed limits. Requires that the department: (1) work with the state police department to administer the pilot program; and (2) enter into an agreement with the state police department to share information regarding the pilot program. Permits the department to contract with a third party vendor to assist in implementing the pilot program. Provides that an individual who is recorded by a worksite speed control system may not be assessed a civil penalty unless the violation is at least 11 miles per hour above the established worksite speed limit. Replaces the term "work zone" with "worksite" throughout the relevant statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Worksite speed control pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-03-21SenateAmendment #1 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote
2023-03-20SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2023-03-20SenatePlaced back on second reading
2023-03-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-03-14SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2023-03-14SenateSenator Doriot added as third sponsor
2023-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2023-02-07HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-06HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Messmer
2023-02-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 70, nays 28
2023-02-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-01-31HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2023-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel
2023-01-09HouseCoauthored by Representatives Prescott, Morrison, Andrade

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback