IN HB1015 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rights of professional firefighters. Provides that a full-time, paid, nonprobationary firefighter has certain minimum protections in addition to any protections provided by contract or other law with regard to the following: (1) The conduct of an interview of the firefighter by the fire department (department) regarding a complaint or internal investigation. (2) The giving of notice by the department to the firefighter of a personnel reassignment, personnel action, or disciplinary action. (3) The disclosure of the firefighter's personal financial information for purposes of a personnel assignment or action. (4) The firefighter's engagement in or refusal to engage in political activity. (Currently these statutes apply only to police officers and police departments.) Repeals a provision that makes the provisions applicable only to police officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of professional firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 33
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Sandlin and Bohacek
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 90, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseRepresentatives Prescott and Boy added as coauthors
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1015/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/3/9/d839af71/HB1015.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/2/0/3a20bcea/HB1015.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/2/e/7b2e8460/HB1015.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/e/3/fee33ac0/HB1015.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/8/6/6b86c1a9/HB1015.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/f/7/14f7136d/HB1015.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/6/1/f46199ed/HB1015.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/0/0/1400d248/HB1015.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/3/2/6e32271b/HB1015.152_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/c/8/3ac8d01b/HB1015.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/8/f/b98f77b6/HB1015.274_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback