IN HB1008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - House advisors appointed: Clere, Braun, Austin and Taylor J
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - House advisors appointed: Clere, Braun, Austin and Taylor J
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce development. Requires the state board of education to use data from the department of workforce development (DWD) in developing and implementing certain plans, recommendations, and other matters relating to career and technical education. Requires the department of education (department) to implement a pilot program for instruction in and the use of the Indiana career explorer program and curriculum by all students in grade 8 attending schools in 15 school corporations. Provides that the pilot program expires July 1, 2018, unless the department determines the pilot program shall be extended until July 1, 2019. Provides that beginning on July 1,
Title
Workforce development. Requires the state board of education to use data from the department of workforce development (DWD) in developing and implementing certain plans, recommendations, and other matters relating to career and technical education. Requires the department of education (department) to implement a pilot program for instruction in and the use of the Indiana career explorer program and curriculum by all students in grade 8 attending schools in 15 school corporations. Provides that the pilot program expires July 1, 2018, unless the department determines the pilot program shall be extended until July 1, 2019. Provides that beginning on July 1,
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Mike Braun [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Braun, Austin and Taylor J |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler and Tallian |
2017-04-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Huston and Porter |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Eckerty and Niezgodski |
2017-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Eckerty and Mishler |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2017-02-23 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2017-02-23 | House | Amendment #3 (Austin) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Clere and Braun |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Huston |