IN HB1008 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) to purchase at full actuarial cost service earned out of state in a position for which the 1977 fund would give credit if the service were earned in Indiana.
Title
Purchase of out-of-state service credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 88 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2010-03-04 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 301: Yeas 93, Nays 1 | |
2010-02-18 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2010-01-25 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: Yeas 90, Nays 5 | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment | |
2010-01-05 | Coauthored by Representative L. Lawson | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Soliday |