IN HB1006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Minimum age to marry and emancipation of minors. Specifies that an "adult" is: (1) a person at least eighteen years of age; or (2) a: (A) married minor who is at least sixteen years of age; or (B) minor that has been completely emancipated by a court; for the purpose of marriage. Raises the minimum age to marry from 15 years of age to 16 years of age. Provides that an individual 16 or 17 years of age may marry only if: (1) the individual's intended spouse is not more than four years older than the individual; (2) a juvenile court has issued an order allowing the individual to marry; and (3) the individual: (A) completes any premarital counseling required under the order; (B) applies for a marriage license not earlier than 15 days after the order is issued; and (C) includes a certified copy of the order with the individual's application for a marriage license. Repeals provisions requiring an individual less than 18 years of age to obtain consent to marry from the individual's parent or guardian. Specifies a process an individual 16 or 17 years of age must follow to petition a juvenile court for an order allowing the individual to marry, and specifies conditions necessary for approval of the petition and conditions requiring denial of the petition. Provides that a court that issues an order allowing an individual at least 16 years of age to marry must also issue an order completely emancipating the individual. Amends the list of records or documents an individual may submit to a court clerk as proof of the individual's date of birth for purposes of applying for a marriage license. Amends the law regarding petitions by minors for emancipation as follows: (1) Provides that a court hearing a minor's petition for emancipation must appoint a guardian ad litem for the minor. (2) Provides that the guardian ad litem shall investigate the statements contained in the minor's petition and file a report of the investigation with the court. (3) Provides that a court may grant a minor's petition for emancipation only if the court finds that emancipation is in the child's best interests. (4) Provides that if the court completely emancipates the child: (A) the child has all the rights and responsibilities of an adult; and (B) the emancipation order may not specify terms of emancipation. Provides that an emancipated child remains subject to: (1) Indiana law concerning minimum age for marriage; and (2) other specific constitutional and statutory age requirements applicable to the emancipated child because of the emancipated child's age. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum age to marry and emancipation of minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Amendment #8 (Austin) failed (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 394: yeas 47, nays 2
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 390: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Baird removed as coauthor
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative DeVon added as coauthor
2020-03-11HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Vermilion A removed as coauthor
2020-03-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crider and Randolph Lonnie M
2020-03-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops
2020-03-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Bartlett and Hatfield
2020-03-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Engleman and Wright
2020-03-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Engleman added as author
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer removed as author
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Engleman removed as coauthor
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 39, nays 11
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-21HouseRepresentatives Bosma, Huston, Bacon, Brown, T., Cherry, Aylesworth, Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Bartlett, Bauer, Campbell, Candelaria Reardon, Clere, Cook, Deal, Engleman, Errington, Frye, Karickhoff, Leonard, Manning, McNamara, Negele, Schaibley, Shackleford, Smith, V., Soliday, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
2020-01-21HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2020-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 84, nays 14
2020-01-16HouseAmendment #9 (Austin) motion withdrawn
2020-01-16HouseAmendment #8 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 28: yeas 40, nays 57
2020-01-16HouseAmendment #10 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-16HouseAmendment #4 (Prescott) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1006/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/c/a/40cae44c/HB1006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/6/a/006a783c/HB1006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/4/d/dd4dfd19/HB1006.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/4/0/2340845a/HB1006.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/4/d/154d0810/HB1006.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/1/2/e4124ced/HB1006.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/e/4/6ae45659/HB1006.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/3/7/f037e41b/HB1006.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/5/e/6f5ef228/HB1006.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/a/784a9f8d/HB1006.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/a/a/23aac200/HB1006.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/8/6/1386628a/HB1006.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/0/e/240e38e1/HB1006.28_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/f/e/6bfe788c/HB1006.30_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/e/d/aeed3140/HB1006.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/4/2/aa422c7e/HB1006.272_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/0/8/a608f483/HB1006.390_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/1/2/6b12a060/HB1006.394_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback