IN HB1006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the nomenclature for felonies from "Class" to "Level" for statutes not amended by HEA 1006-2013. Removes criminal gang activity, criminal gang intimidation, and certain drug offenses from the list of crimes over which a juvenile court does not have jurisdiction. Authorizes pretrial diversion for persons charged with a Level 5 or Level 6 felony. Prohibits a credit restricted felon from obtaining sentence modification. Provides that, not later than 365 days after: (1) a convicted person begins serving the person's sentence; and (2) the court obtains a report from the department of correction concerning the convicted person's conduct while imprisoned; the court may reduce or suspend the person's sentence and impose any sentence the court was authorized to impose at the time of sentencing. Specifies that, if more than 365 days have elapsed since the convicted person began serving the sentence, the court may reduce or suspend the sentence and impose any sentence the court was authorized to impose at the time of sentencing. Limits the filing of subsequent petitions to modify a sentence, and removes the requirement that the court hold a hearing. Requires a court to explain its reasons for imposing a sentence unless the court imposes an advisory sentence. Increases the number of crimes that are nonsuspendible. Makes changes to the penalties for the crimes of dealing in cocaine or a narcotic drug and dealing in methamphetamine. Allows a court to suspend any part of a sentence for a Level 2 felony or a Level 3 felony concerning a controlled substance. Enhances the penalties for certain controlled substance offenses if a person commits an offense: (1) within
Title
Reconciles technical and substantive conflicts between HEA 1006-2013 (the criminal code revision bill) and other bills concerning criminal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 100603 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 100602 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100601 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 100603 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 100602 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100601 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 168 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 418: yeas 46 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 485: yeas 84 and nays 12 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hume added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Head added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Steele added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Lawson added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative McMillin added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Pierce added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 345: yeas 45 and nays 2 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #8 (Bray), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #1 (Glick), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #2 (Steele), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #5 (Head), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 25, nays 21. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #3 (Tomes), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1006 Amendment #7 (Taylor), failed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 90 and nays 4 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator M. Young added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Pierce, Lawson L |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald. |