IN HB1003 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Third reading: call withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the committee on the administration of public assistance (committee) and specifies the committee's responsibilities. Sets forth requirements for a system for making eligibility determinations for public assistance services. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to establish an independent monitoring system to evaluate the quality of the eligibility determinations for public assistance services and sets forth requirements for the monitoring system. Requires the office to attempt to resolve any issues with an application for public assistance in the office's initial contact with the applicant. Requires the office to post specified material on the office's website. Specifies actions to be taken by the office if an unfavorable evaluation is received or if a majority of the committee votes to terminate a contract for eligibility determinations for public assistance services. Requires a public assistance office to provide voter registration assistance to each individual who in person, by telephone, or by electronic means applies for service or assistance, applies for recertification or renewal of services or assistance, or submits a change of address form. Requires that voter registration forms allow, but not require, an individual completing the form to provide an electronic mail address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public assistance matters and voting registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 Third reading: call withdrawn
2010-01-25 Amendment 2 (Battles), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Amendment 3 (Riecken), prevailed; Roll Call 52: Yeas 49, Nays 45
2010-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-13 Representative Tyler added as coauthor
2010-01-05 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2009-11-17 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2009-11-17 Authored by Representative Riecken

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback