IL SR2366 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares December 4-10, 2016 as "Illinois Groundwater Awareness Week".
Title
IL GROUNDWATER AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions December 1, 2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2366&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR2366.htm |