IL SR1852 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Brings attention to the cases of legal permanent veterans who have been deported from the United States to the attention of the members of Congress and to the President of the United States in a determined effort to win the return of these veterans to their families, children, and communities in the United States.
Title
RETURN DEPORTED VETERANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-001 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1852&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR1852.htm |