IL SR1782 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to recognize the Ku Klux Klan as a terrorist organization and pursue dismantling this domestic terrorist hate group with the same fervor used to protect the United States from other manifestations of terrorism.
Title
KU KLUX KLAN - TERRORIST GROUP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1782&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR1782.htm |