IL SR1781 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of May of 2016 as Motorcycle Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
MOTORCYCLE AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1781&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR1781.htm |