IL SR1780 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 13, 2018 as "Suicide Awareness Day" in Illinois.
Title
SUICIDE AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1780&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1780.htm |