IL SR1761 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Rauner administration to comply with the statutory goal of 20% participation with minority and women-owned firms, particularly as it relates to professional services and legal services.
Title
MINORITY-WOMEN BUSINESSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |