IL SR0957 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges all private and public high schools, colleges, and universities in the State of Illinois to provide information to all students and parents about meningococcal disease, explaining the different disease serogroups, symptoms, risks, treatments, and the availability, benefits, risks, and limitations of all meningococcal vaccines. Urges each private and public high school, college, and university in the State to recommend that current and entering students receive meningococcal vaccines in accordance with current Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices guidelines.
Title
MENINGOCOCCAL DISEASE INFO
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 3, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=957&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR0957.htm |