IL SR0868 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the utilization of small, diverse, and veteran-owned firms, as M/WBE and DBE programs have demonstrated success in promoting economic opportunity, equity and access. Supports federal DBE standards and programs to ensure the success of the Illinois Department of Transportation's DBE Program. Urges Congress to take action to protect the USDOT DBE program and M/WBE and DBE programs overall.
Title
SUPPORT-M/WBE & DBE PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=868&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0868.htm |