IL SR0794 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Passed on August 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Passed on August 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges law enforcement to recognize white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups as terrorist organizations, and to pursue dismantling the criminal elements of these domestic terrorist organizations in the same manner as other manifestations of terrorism.
Title
NEO-NAZIS/DOMESTIC TERRORISM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=794&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0794.htm |