IL SR0582 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests that no State or local government agency or official should expend any time, facilities, equipment, information, or other resources of the agency or official to facilitate the creation, publication, or maintenance of or any participation in any federal program with the purpose of registering or maintaining a database of individuals present in the United States based on their race, color, ancestry, national origin, or religion.
Title
NO NATIONAL REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 015-001-000 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |