IL SR0582 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requests that no State or local government agency or official should expend any time, facilities, equipment, information, or other resources of the agency or official to facilitate the creation, publication, or maintenance of or any participation in any federal program with the purpose of registering or maintaining a database of individuals present in the United States based on their race, color, ancestry, national origin, or religion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO NATIONAL REGISTRY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-10-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-10-25SenateBe Adopted Executive; 015-001-000
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-10-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-10-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-05-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback