IL SR0400 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Children and Family Services to develop a plan, in collaboration with the private agencies that serve the majority of youth in care, to create a review system for any child in its care when he or she enters his or her third placement.
Title
DCFS - CHILD CARE PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=400&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0400.htm |