IL SR0289 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 7, 2021 as Victims of Communism Memorial Day.
Title
VICTIMS OF COMMUNISM DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=289&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0289.htm |