IL SR0268 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the accomplishments of Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972, also known as the Patsy Takemoto Mink Equal Opportunity in Education Act, in increasing opportunities for women and girls in all facets of education. Recognizes the magnificent accomplishments of women and girls in sports, as well as the need to continue pursuing the goal of Title IX.
Title
TITLE IX ACCOMPLISHMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Erica Harriss [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=268&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0268.htm |