IL SR0262 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States to lift the restrictions currently in place that prevent Poland from being admitted to the visa waiver program.
Title
URGE POTUS-POLAND VISA WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-08 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 8, 2011 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=262&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SR/09700SR0262.htm |