IL SR0190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes any effort to divert water from Lake Michigan, or the other Great Lakes, to outside of the Great Lakes Basin.
Title
SUPPORT GREAT LAKES BASIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |