IL SR0176 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Little League International to rescind its decision to strip the Jackie Robinson West Little League team of its 2014 United States Championship and to investigate the other teams that play in the Little League tournament.
Title
JACKIE ROBINSON WEST - RESCIND
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=176&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR0176.htm |