IL SR0150 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 29, 2021 as College Savings Day in the State of Illinois to help raise awareness about the escalating costs of higher education and the importance of saving for college with the help of 529 college savings plans.
Title
COLLEGE SAVINGS DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] |
Sen. John Connor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Be Adopted Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=150&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0150.htm |