IL SR0085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges support for funding the physical infrastructure of early childhood education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILDHOOD PROGRAMS-FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateResolution Adopted
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateBe Adopted Education; 015-000-000
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Education
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback