IL SJR0030 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the dire need for statewide expansion of 211 Illinois services to prevent Illinois individuals and families who are experiencing poverty and/or financial hardship from requiring child welfare system involvement. Recognizes the importance of supportive funding for services that promote child and family well-being and prevent children from entering the child welfare system. Urges state agencies serving children and families to utilize data generated by the 211 Illinois online dashboard to identify gaps in services and to develop resources and services to fill the identified gaps. Recognizes state funding is necessary to adequately support the expansion and maintenance of 211 Illinois statewide and the community-based organizations that ultimately provide the supportive services. Urges support for prioritizing funding efforts dedicated to preventing the need for child welfare related services in counties that have been identified as experiencing gaps in offered services based on data collected from 211 Illinois.
Title
URGES-SUPPORT 211 ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-039-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-05-18 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Health and Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=30&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SJR/10300SJ0030.htm |