IL SJR0003 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaims March 30, 2013 and March 30, 2014 as "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
PROCLAIMS-WELCOME VIETNAM VET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 14, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 011-000-000 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJR/09800SJ0003.htm |