IL SJR0003 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Great Migration Centennial Commission to work toward the commemoration and celebration of the Great Migration Centennial.
Title
GREAT MIGRATION COMMISSION
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Keith Farnham [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2012-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-05-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended 050-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hunter |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 8, 2011 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Commerce; 005-002-002 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |