IL SJR0003 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the members of the Illinois delegation to Congress to phase out Medicare's two-year waiting period so that persons under age 65 with Alzheimer's disease are eligible for Medicare immediately after receiving their determination of disability.
Title
CONGRESS-MEDICARE-ALZHEIMER'S
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Resolution Adopted 116-001-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-05-21 | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-04-30 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-29 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-29 | Resolution Adopted as Amended 056-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Be Adopted as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-02-19 | Held in Human Services | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with Secretary |