IL SJR0001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress for the calling of a convention for proposing amendments to the United States Constitution.
Title
U.S. CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SJR/10000SJ0001.htm |