IL SB4165 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that a child protective investigator is authorized to carry and use personal protection spray devices, such as mace, pepper mace, or pepper gas, for self-defense purposes while investigating a report of child abuse or neglect if the child protective investigator has been trained on the proper use of such personal protection spray devices by the Illinois State Police. Requires the Illinois State Police to establish a training program for child protective investigators on the proper use of personal protection spray devices for self-defense purposes. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide funding for the training program. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-INVESTIGATOR-PEPPER SPRAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4165&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4165.htm |