IL SB3992 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tenant Protection Act. Provides that a landlord may increase the rent no more than once every 12 months, by an amount no greater than the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the same 12-month period or 3%, whichever is lower. Creates the Residential Rental Registry and requires a landlord to pay a rental registry fee. Requires a landlord to register all dwelling units with the Illinois Housing Development Authority by January 15th of each year. Creates the Right to Counsel Program and directs the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts to contract with or enter a memorandum of agreement with an administering entity to administer the Right to Counsel Program. Creates the Small Rental Property Owner Repairs and Improvement Fund and provides that money in the Fund shall be used by the Illinois Housing Development Authority to provide financial support in the form of grants, zero-interest loans, or low-interest loans to owners with no more than 12 dwelling units. Provides that a landlord found liable for charging rent in excess of the Act shall pay the prevailing tenant damages. Creates the Tenant Bill of Rights, with provisions governing exclusions, the identification of an owner and agent, a landlord's right of access, prohibited harassment, required notices, a landlord's responsibility to maintain, a tenant's remedies, security deposits, notification of foreclosure actions, and the prohibition of retaliatory conduct by a landlord. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a rental property capital improvement credit. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Adds provisions governing the refusal to renew and the termination of a tenancy for other good cause. Removes a provision regarding the notice to terminate a tenancy for less than a year. Makes other changes. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act and the Condominium Property Act. Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act. Effective immediately.
Title
TENANT PROTECTION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 825 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3992&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3992.htm |