IL SB3936 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Student Confidential Reporting Act. Subject to appropriation, requires the Illinois State Police, in consultation with the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, State Board of Education, Department of Children and Family Services, and the Department of Human Services, to establish a program for receiving reports and other information from the public regarding potential self-harm or potential harm or criminal acts directed at school students, school employees, or schools in this State. Requires the program to include a Safe2Help Illinois helpline (defined as a school helpline involving a statewide toll-free telephone number, social media, a website, or other means of communication, or a combination of a toll-free telephone number and another means of communication, that transmits voice, text, photographic, or other messages and information to the Safe2Help Illinois operators). Provides for referrals from and the discontinuance of other State-operated school violence help lines (excluding the CPS Violence Prevention Hotline). Sets forth other program and Illinois State Police requirements. Contains provisions concerning the confidentiality of reported information, funding, and annual reporting. Provides that a Safe2Help Illinois employee, law enforcement agency, or law enforcement official acting in good faith in compliance with the Act shall have immunity from any civil or criminal liability that might otherwise occur as a result of handling tips, with the exception of willful or wanton misconduct. Provides that the Illinois State Police may adopt emergency rules to implement the Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
STUDENT SCHOOL HELPLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0752 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-620 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |