IL SB3913 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a sealed court file shall be made available to a State or local government employee or contractor responsible for processing court-based rental assistance. Requires prospective counsel to request a sealed court file in a specified form. Allows a scholarly, public policy, court reform agency, educational, journalistic, or governmental body to access all sealed files by filing a motion with the judge presiding over evictions in that judicial district or county. Changes operative and repeal dates to August 1, 2024 (currently August 1, 2022). Makes conforming changes in the Article and the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.
Title
EVICTION-SEALING COURT FILE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-121.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3913&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3913.htm |