IL SB3900 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Right to Read Act. Provides that the State Board of Education shall offer support: to each public school district to select evidence-based core reading instruction programs and implement them using structured literacy instruction; and to each early childhood, elementary, and special education teacher, reading specialist, literacy coach, and administrator to complete evidence-based training in teaching reading. Requires the State Board of Education to annually compile and post on its website information on the steps it has undertaken to support school districts to deliver high-quality, evidence-based literacy instruction, including a list of any Early Literacy Grant recipients, documentation of how the recipient allocated the funding to support improved literacy, and what evidence-based literacy curricula the recipient is utilizing. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning educator testing, requires applicants seeking specified licenses to pass a test in reading foundations, which shall include assessment of the applicant's understanding of phonological and phonemic awareness, concepts of print and the alphabetic principle, the role of phonics in promoting reading development, word analysis skills and strategies, vocabulary development, application of reading comprehension skills and strategies, and methods for assessing reading development. In provisions concerning minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries, provides that an applicant who has successfully completed a reading foundations test of at least comparable rigor to the Illinois reading foundations test is not required to complete a reading foundations test. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RIGHT TO READ ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 25, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |