IL SB3794 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that child welfare supervisors shall satisfy specified requirements. Provides that the Central Office of Licensing at the Department of Children and Family Services shall convene a 5 person panel to review all transcripts and course information and make a decision on the equivalency of the college degree to a human services degree. Provides that the panel must include representation from a community-based provider.
Title
CHILD WELFARE SUPERVISOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3794&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3794.htm |