IL SB3794 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the External Auditing and Standards Board Act. Provides that the Board shall consist of 8 members, and sets forth the membership of the Board. Provides that the Board shall assist the Legislative Audit Commission, the Office of the Auditor General, and the Governor in improving the timeliness, transparency, and process of financial reporting by State agencies. Provides that the Board has certain powers, including the power to suspend or dismiss an internal auditor of any State agency who is deemed unqualified by the Board based on current best practices and qualifications. Requires the Board to develop a certification program for all internal and external auditors. Requires the Board to submit certain reports to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the State agency.
Title
FINANCIAL REPORT STANDARDS BD
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Thomas Johnson [R] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1055 |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2012 |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2012-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2012-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-05-04 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-010-002 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |