IL SB3763 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides for the awarding of bilingual education teacher scholarships to persons meeting specified requirements. Requires the principal, or his or her designee, of an approved high school to certify to the Commission, for students who are Illinois residents and are completing an application for the scholarship, that the student ranked scholastically in the upper one-half of their graduating class at the end of the sixth semester. Provides teacher education program enrollment requirements. Provides post-scholarship teaching requirements and exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
BILINGUAL TEACHER SCHOLARSHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3763&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3763.htm |