IL SB3699 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. In provisions concerning the State Aviation Program Fund, provides that grant moneys in excess of $30,000,000 shall be distributed by the Department of Transportation to airports for capital development purposes for projects identified on Transportation Improvement Plans submitted by airports on a discretionary basis by the Illinois Division of Aeronautics. Makes changes concerning the transfer of surplus moneys from the Aviation Fuel Sales Tax Refund Fund to the State Aviation Program Fund and the General Revenue Fund. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Makes changes concerning the distribution of proceeds from sales of aviation fuel.
Title
FINANCE-AVIATION
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-20.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |