IL SB3656 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Mortgage Foreclosure Prevention Volunteer Corps Act. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
FORECLOSURE PREVENT CORPS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Postponed - Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-02-23 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-02-22 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3656&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3656.htm |